judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00256-CR
01-94-00256-CR
03/11/1994
Other Drug Possession
Bonilla, Jose Victor
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/1995Mandate issued
01/10/1995No petition for review or writ of error was filed
12/26/1994Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/08/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/08/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/07/1994Submitted
11/07/1994Submission
11/07/1994Submitted
10/14/1994Submission
09/06/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/06/1994Case ready to be set
09/06/1994Case ready to be set
08/15/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/14/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/14/1994Statement of facts filed
07/05/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
06/16/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/13/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
04/05/1994Transcript filed
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/07/1994Notice of appeal filed
02/04/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/13/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
StateCriminal - AppellantWerner Voigt, Jr.
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
Honorable JIMMY JAMES
661,511
10 yrs deferred adj.