judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00137-CR
04-94-00137-CR
03/11/1994
Other Drug Sale
Salinas, Annette
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/2017Internal memo
08/28/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
08/28/1995Mandate received by the trial court
08/24/1995Mandate Issued
08/24/1995Mandate Issued
06/28/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/28/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1995Submitted
06/21/1995Submission
06/21/1995Submitted
05/10/1995Submission
04/17/1995Case ready to be set
04/17/1995Brief Filed
04/17/1995Case ready to be set
03/23/1995Brief Filed
03/21/1995Order Entered
03/21/1995Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/1995Motion to Consolidated Cases Filed
03/02/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1995Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/09/199510 Day letter to attorneys on no app's br filed
08/02/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/11/199410 Day letter to attorneys on no app's br filed
05/16/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/29/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994Mot. EOT to file NOA DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/22/1994No Description Available.
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/07/1994Mot. EOT to file NOA Filed
03/07/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
12/01/1993Motion for New Trial Filed
11/22/1993Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/2017Case StoredCase archived
07/13/2017Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJennifer B. Rosenblatt
Salinas, AnnetteCriminal - AppellantJose M. Guerrero
Trial Court Information
81st Judicial District Court
Atascosa
Honorable Olin Bernard Strauss
91-03-0071-CRA
50 years & $10,000 fine