judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BROTHERS (TERRENCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36360
Short Caption:BROTHERS (TERRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C111628Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/23/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/29/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-11087
07/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/11/97; 11/13/97; 04/03/98; 03/19/98; 02/19/98; 05/11/99; 09/17/98; 04/15/99; 09/10/99; 09/03/99; 10/08/99; 10/28/99; 03/30/00; 05/25/00; 04/24/00. To Court Reporter: Free Lance Court Reporters, Court Reporter Company, Dept. XVI. 00-11738
07/18/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-12366
07/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment of Conviction filed 8/9/94. Due Date: 10 days
07/31/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial) filed in district court on August 9, 1994. 00-13212
08/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days. 00-14679
08/30/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived District Court Order/Judgment. Copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 8/22/00 received from Clark County District Attorney. (Courtesy copy only--not certified.)
09/05/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Finding of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on August 22, 2000. 00-15545
09/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: August 22, 2000. 00-15547
09/18/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: State's Request to Reset Briefing Schedule, Thursday, April 15, 1999; Evidentiary Hearing, Friday, September 10, 1999; Scheduled Status Check: Decision, dated Friday, October 8, 1999. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 00-16445
09/18/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/11/97;11/13/97;02/19/98;03/19/98;04/03/98. To Court Reporter: Kit McDonald, Department XVI. 00-16448
09/18/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/19/98; 03/19/98; 09/17/98; 05/11/99; 09/03/99; 10/28/99; 03/30/00; 04/24/00; 05/25/00. To Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell, Department XVI. 00-16450
10/16/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due:11/15/00. 00-18348
11/15/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) 00-20009
11/17/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 09/17/98; 10/28/99; 09/03/99; 04/24/00; 05/25/00; Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. 00-20248
11/20/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before December 7, 2000. 00-20325
12/04/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/11/97; 3/19/98; 4/3/98. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 00-21124
12/07/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21371
12/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extenions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforseeable circumstances. 00-21554
12/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 00-21838
12/13/2000BriefReceived Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/12/00. 00-21839
12/13/2000AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-21841
12/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Opening Brief). 00-22625
01/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 13, 2000, appellant filed a motion to file a sixty-three page opening brief and submitted provisionally an opening brief and appendix. We grant appellant's unopposed motion. The clerk of the court shall file the opening brief and appendix received provisionally on December 13, 2000. On July 10, 2000, appellant filed a transcript request form requesting the preparation of transcripts by Free lance Court Reporters. We note that appellant has included copies of the above transcripts in his appendix and the opening brief does not cite to any transcripts that were not included in the appendix. Unless notified otherwise in writing within 15 days of the date of this order, we deem all transcripts necessary for this appeal to be filed with this court. 01-00602
01/11/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: FedEx 12/12/00. 00-21839
01/11/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 16. 00-21841
02/07/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 15, 2001. 01-02457
03/19/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-04849
03/20/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have 5 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 01-04932
03/22/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-05048
04/23/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 31 pages. 01-06816
04/23/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: FedEx 04/20/01. 01-06818
04/23/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-11726
08/06/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11865
08/06/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2002. 02-11865