judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HELLINA JACKSON V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY

Case Information: 10-CV-1570
Short Caption:HELLINA JACKSON V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7627-10Filed Date:12/09/2010

Opening Event Date:12/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHellina Jackson Y
Thomas MarkYN
AppelleeD.C. Housing AuthorityN
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Nicole C. Mason YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 9, 2010, and it appea ring that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
01/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/22/10) (elp) *Construed as the MAT
01/19/2011NOTICE RECEIVED-from aplt re: transcripts (*stating that appellant has paid for and obtained transcript for this appeal.) (elp)
01/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (101-pgs/tape 11/22/10 proc.) w/cd
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/09/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/09/2011APPENDIX - attached to Appellant's Brief
04/08/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/08/2011APPENDIX aple
04/08/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
04/29/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
08/02/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/13/2011FiledStipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledOrder Granting stipulationof dismissal.
01/05/2012FiledDismissed
03/13/2012FiledMandate