judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00258-CV
01-94-00258-CV
03/11/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Liles, John Edward
Suzanne Finstad, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/11/1997Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
01/17/1997Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/17/1997Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/18/1996Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
01/24/1996Case file received by higher Court or agency.
01/17/1996Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
01/02/1996Writ filed
12/30/1995Writ Due
11/30/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
11/30/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/01/1995Motion for rehearing filed
09/01/1995Motion for Rehearing Due
09/01/1995Motion for rehearing filed
08/16/1995Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
08/04/1995Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/27/1995Post submission brief
06/27/1995Post submission brief
06/20/1995Submitted
06/20/1995Submission
06/20/1995Submitted
06/12/1995Motion to extend time to file sup brief
03/16/1995Submission
01/27/1995Appellate filing fee due or appeal may be dismissed
10/24/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/24/1994Case ready to be set
10/24/1994Case ready to be set
09/08/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/08/1994Motion to strike disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/08/1994Motion to strike filed
07/21/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
07/21/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
07/11/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/11/1994Motion to strike filed
07/06/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/28/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/27/1994Supplemental transcript filed
05/26/1994Order entered
05/12/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
05/12/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
05/09/1994Motion to strike filed
05/05/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/05/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
05/02/1994Motion to extend time to file sup brief
04/29/1994Motion for leave to file strans
04/20/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/14/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
04/14/1994Supplemental transcript filed
03/31/1994Motion for leave to file strans
03/31/1994Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
03/31/1994Statement of facts filed
03/31/1994Transcript filed
03/28/1994Motion to extend time to file transcript
03/11/1994Motion to extend time to file transcript
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/17/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeWilliam W. Ogden
StateAppellantTom Bayko
StateAppellantJohn L. Hagan
StateAppelleeJoel R. White
StateAppelleeAndrea Chan
StateAppellantD. Faye Caldwell
StateAppelleeArthur Pertile
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
92C1644