judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00249-CR
01-94-00249-CR
03/11/1994
Assault & battery
Wilson, Jeffrey Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/10/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/15/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
08/31/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/31/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/11/1995Submitted
07/11/1995Submission
07/11/1995Submitted
06/05/1995Brief Due
05/30/1995Submission
05/11/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
05/11/1995Case ready to be set
05/11/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/11/1995Waiver
05/11/1995Case ready to be set
04/27/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/13/1995Brief Due
04/13/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
03/23/1995Brief Due
03/23/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/09/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/21/1995Brief Due
02/21/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/16/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/30/1995Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/28/1995Brief Due
01/12/1995Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/28/1994Brief Due
12/28/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/28/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/24/1994Brief Due
10/24/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/15/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/08/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/04/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/26/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/23/1994Statement of facts filed
05/19/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/09/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/06/1994Transcript filed
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/10/1994Notice of appeal filed
03/09/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TEXAS, THE STATE OFCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantTerrence A. Gaiser
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
Honorable JAY W. BURNETT
676,515
40 yrs tdc