judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00120-CV
13-94-00120-CV
03/09/1994
Miscellaneous civil
The Town of South Padre Island, Texas, on behalf of its Board of Adjustment a/k/a Board of Adjustments & Appeals
Frank Tolley
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1995Mandate Issued
12/06/1995Record returned to Court.
11/22/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/28/1995Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/1995Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
07/05/1995Writ Filed
07/05/1995Writ of Error Fee Paid
06/01/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/19/1995Motion for rehearing filed
05/04/1995Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
03/24/1995Sworn Statement filed
03/16/1995Submitted
03/16/1995Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
03/16/1995Motion for Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/1995Submission
03/14/1995Motion to allow oral argument.
02/07/1995Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/05/1995Submission
07/21/1994Brief Filed
07/21/1994No oral argument requested
06/16/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/10/1994AGREEMENT FILED
06/02/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/19/1994Brief Filed
05/19/1994Case ready to be set
05/19/1994Oral argument requested
04/07/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/05/1994Additional copies of motion for extension of time
04/01/1994Statement Filed
04/01/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/31/1994Notice was filed
03/31/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/1994Miscellaneous Motion
03/21/1994Sworn Statement filed
03/16/1994Miscellaneous Motion
03/09/1994Transcript Filed
03/09/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/08/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frank TolleyAppelleeSteven W. Stark
James H. Owen
The Town Of South Padre IslandAppellantPaul Y. Cunningham
P. T. Moore, Jr.
Trial Court Information
107th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Benjamin Euresti
92-10-6835-A