judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00071-CV
02-94-00071-CV
03/08/1994
Injunction
Mathieson, Paul
Midwest Storage Partners, An Indiana General Partnership and Shreve & Co., Inc., An Indiana Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/17/1994Mandate Issued
08/24/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
08/18/1994Letter
07/21/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
06/09/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/03/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/20/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
04/14/1994Exhibits Filed
04/14/1994No Description Available.
04/12/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/23/1994No Description Available.
03/21/1994Submission
03/21/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/08/1994No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Midwest Storage Partners, An IAppelleeJohn T. Palter
Mathieson, PaulAppellantDavid Osborn
Shreve & Co., Inc.AppelleeJohn T. Palter
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ken Curry
153-146816-93