judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00226-CV
14-94-00226-CV
03/09/1994
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: Donahue, Michael J.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/18/1994Case stored
03/17/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
03/17/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
03/10/1994Mtn.Lv.file habeas corpus DISPOSED - REL, RESDENIED
03/09/1994Mtn.Lv.file habeas corpus FILED - REL, RES
03/09/1994Petit.writ of habeas corpus RECEIVED-REL,RES
03/09/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/18/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 257th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorAudley H. Heath
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentMartha C. Pitkin
Trial Court Information
257th District Court
Harris
Honorable LINDA MOTHERAL
84-02543