judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00232-CV
01-94-00232-CV
03/08/1994
Original proceeding for writ of habeas corpus (Gov't 22.221(d))
Ex Parte: Charles Willy Alpine
Texas, The State of
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/1995Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
04/10/1995Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus
04/08/1994Motion for rehearing was not filed
03/24/1994Opinion issuedOverruled
03/24/1994Opinion issuedOverruled
03/08/1994Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus
03/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/08/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRelatorCharles Willy Alpine
Trial Court Information