judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GASSTOP TWO, LLC v. SEATWO, LLC, and LAWRENCE N. SMALL and JILL SMALL

Case Heading (S-09-0052)
Case Number:S-09-0052Case Docketed On:03/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:GASSTOP TWO, LLC v. SEATWO, LLC, and LAWRENCE N. SMALL and JILL SMALL
Full Title:GASSTOP TWO, LLC, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SEATWO, LLC, and LAWRENCE N. SMALL and JILL SMALL, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGasstop Two, LLCThomas E. Lubnau II
Ryan William McGrath
AppelleeSeatwo, LLCRex O. Arney
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeLawrence N. SmallRex O. Arney
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeJill SmallRex O. Arney
Orintha Elizabeth Karns

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities
Opinion Number:2010 WY 24
Citation:225 P.3d 1072

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/16/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/27/2009Event - Phone Call. Received phone call from Mr. Lubnau's office regarding pleadings missing from clerk's index. They will contact the District Court clerk for an amended index. It appears that the opening pleadings in CV-2005-0164 (complaint and answer) are missing from the index on these consolidated cases.EventPhone CallFinal
04/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended index from District Court ClerkNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/01/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/18/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/02/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant; and received copy of supplement to designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/09/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Lubnau for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Orintha Karns for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Thomas E. Lubnau, II and Ryan W. McGrath, argument by Mr. Lubnau for appellant; Rex O. Arney and Orintha E. Karns, argument by Ms. Karns for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/04/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/22/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/22/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/24/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/23/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal