judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LORETTA T. DIDONATO V. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONS

Case Information: 10-BG-1563
Short Caption:LORETTA T. DIDONATO V. COMMITTEE ON ADMISSIONSClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Committee On Admissions
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLoretta T. Didonato NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Committee on AdmissionsN
Mark S. Carlin NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/17/2010FILING FEE $100.00.
12/22/2010ORDER On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that this matter is referred to the Committee on Admissions for its recommendation as to whether the relief sought by the petitioner should be afforded by this court. (JC)
01/21/2011REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF COMM. ON ADMISSIONS that the petition be denied.
02/09/2011FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/09/2011DENIED On consideration of the petition for review, and the report and recommendation of the Committee on Admission thereto, it is ORDERED that the petition for review is denied. (GL,TH,TE)
02/23/2011PTNR'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
05/04/2011ORDER DENYING PTNR PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC ORDERED by the merits division * that the petition for rehearing is denied; and it appearing that no judge of this court has called for a vote on the petition for rehearing en banc, it is FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for rehearing en banc is denied. (WH, RZ,*GL,**KR,FI,BR,TH,OB,**RD,*TE)
05/09/2011ORDER On consideration of petitioner's motion to expedite the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc, and it appearing that the court issued an order on May 4, 2011, denying petitioner's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc, it is ORDERED that the petitioner's motion is denied as moot. (JAC)