judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0224
94-0224
03/09/1994
See former TRAP 130(D)
SOUTHWEST SANITATION INC.
CITY OF BONHAM
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/10/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/25/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/29/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
07/28/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
05/12/1994Case forwarded to Court
05/10/1994Reply to Response
04/25/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/21/1994Phone call from Clerk's Officecalled to COA - Application HAS BEEN filed
03/09/1994APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDon or before the 1st of April, 1994
03/09/1994Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedapp due 04-01-94
03/09/1994Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/29/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CITY OF BONHAMRespondentMr. Ronald H. Clark
SOUTHWEST SANITATION, INC.PetitionerMr. David C. Turner Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
06-93-00067-CV
Reversed & Rendered
871 SW2d 765, 01-05-94
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Fannin
Honorable Ray F. Grisham
30331