judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0270-94
PD-0270-94
03/10/1994
PDR Case Type
ENNIS, NICHOLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/15/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/29/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/29/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/12/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
03/10/1994PDR FILED
03/10/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/28/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJaime Esparza
ENNIS, NICHOLASApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Daniel R. Malone
Court of Appeals Information:
08-92-00369-CR
AFF 11-24-93
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
El Paso
Honorable SAM W. CALLAN
62080-205