judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00244-CV
01-94-00244-CV
03/09/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Washington, Samuel
Naylor Industrial Services, Inc.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/04/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/25/1995No petition for review or writ of error was filed
03/21/1995Date final opinion release for publication
03/10/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
02/23/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/23/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/24/1995Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
01/17/1995Submitted
01/17/1995Submission
01/17/1995Submitted
01/10/1995Motion for leave to file
11/15/1994Submission
05/02/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/02/1994Case ready to be set
05/02/1994Case ready to be set
04/05/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/21/1994Filing Fee in the amount of $50 paid-trans filed
03/09/1994Transcript filed
03/09/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/11/1994Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantJerald David Mize
StateAppelleeSamuel E. Hooper
StateAppelleeEric R. Miller
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
91-28000