judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00063-CV
02-94-00063-CV
03/09/1994
Divorce
Morris, Donald L.
Morris, Elizabeth Lawler
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/16/1995Mandate Issued
03/30/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/15/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/28/1995Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
12/23/1994Other Document Filed
10/10/1994Submitted
10/10/1994Submission
09/20/1994Submission
09/05/1994Submitted
08/16/1994Submission
08/08/1994Brief Filed
08/08/1994Case ready to be set
06/07/1994Brief Filed
04/12/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/08/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/09/1994No Description Available.
03/09/1994No Description Available.
03/09/1994Submission
03/09/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morris, Elizabeth LawlerAppelleeLeigh Ann Fouts
Morris, Donald L.AppellantRichard B. Tanner
Trial Court Information
231st District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Randy Catterton
231-174920-92