judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00366-CV
05-94-00366-CV
03/09/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Hur, Woon, Myeng Hee Hur & Wood Young Hur
City of Mesquite & Ted Barron
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/28/1994MattConv
03/23/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/23/1994Motion - Ext to File Bond DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/23/1994Transcript Filed
03/18/1994Response to Motion
03/09/1994Appeal Bond Filed
03/09/1994MattConv
03/09/1994Motion - Ext. to File Bond
03/09/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/24/1993Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1992Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B Brown
88-12175-D