judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00367-CV
05-94-00367-CV
03/09/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Henry, Dovie Irene
Cullum Companies, Inc., n/k/a Tom Thumb Food & Drugs, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/09/1994Transcript Filed
03/09/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/23/1994Appeal Bond Filed
01/26/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1992Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
298th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable William Black
94-1519-M