judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00413-CR
05-94-00413-CR
03/11/1994
Fugitive From Justice
Hobbs, Rex Clifford
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/01/1994Mandate Issued
08/01/1994Mandate Issued
06/01/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
06/01/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
05/31/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
05/10/1994Letter Sent by the Court
04/13/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/07/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
03/25/1994Letter Sent by the Court
03/25/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
03/25/1994Transcript Filed
03/25/1994Transcript Tendered
03/11/1994Notice Sent
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/03/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/21/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/01/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Lena Levario
WX94-00114-Q
FFJ - Extradition