judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0280-94
PD-0280-94
03/11/1994
PDR Case Type
MILLER, MICHAEL JOSEPH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/25/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/06/1994FINAL DISPRefused
04/20/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/20/1994PDR DISPRefused
03/25/1994RESPONSE FILED
03/11/1994PDR FILED
03/11/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MILLER, MICHAEL JOSEPHApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Ken J. Mclean
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-93-00215-CR
AFF 2-3-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
Honorable WOODY DENSEN
656917