judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00073-CR
12-94-00073-CR
03/11/1994
Theft
Potts, Eltroy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/03/1995
11/03/1995Case stored
10/18/1995Mandate Issued
10/02/1995
09/15/1995
08/31/1995Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/31/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/08/1995Submitted
06/08/1995Submission
06/05/1995Letter from the Court
05/17/1995Submission
10/07/1994
09/07/1994Brief Filed
09/07/1994Case ready to be set
08/26/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/26/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/23/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/12/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/09/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/27/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/27/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/31/1994Brief Filed
05/02/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/02/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/08/1994Motion or Writ Granted
04/08/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
03/30/1994motion for extension of time to file sfacts
03/30/1994
03/30/1994
03/22/1994Letter from the Court
03/11/1994No Description Available.
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/16/1993Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
12/02/1993Notice of Appeal Filed
11/16/1993
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
11/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Potts, EltroyCriminal - AppellantMr. Daniel R. Scarbrough
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Jeffrey Herrington
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Anderson
Honorable Jerry L. Calhoon
20833
8 yrs/TDC & $500 fine