judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN LEWIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0047)
Case Number:S-09-0047Case Docketed On:03/09/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:JOHN LEWIS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN LEWIS, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerJohn LewisDiane Elizabeth Courselle
Sarah Miles
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/09/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/09/2009Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
03/09/2009Petition - Writ - review and two volumes of exhibitsPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
03/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Faxed copy of consent of client filed in the trial court. Consent of Client for the Supreme Court forthcomingNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Sarah Miles to appear on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
03/20/2009Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
03/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Respondent's Response to Petition for Writ of ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2009Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
03/31/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal