judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID HICKS, III V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1571
Short Caption:DAVID HICKS, III V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7589-09Filed Date:12/13/2010

Opening Event Date:12/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid Hicks, IIIYPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Richard S. LoveNY
AppelleeMetropolitian Police DepartmentN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeMpdC Office of Unified CommunicationN
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeAdrienne Poteat N
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeStephanie Gray N
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeD.C. Housing AuthorityN
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyNN
AppelleeWilliam Pitmen N
Todd S. KimNY
AppelleeTameika (Officer) Massey N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 13, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
01/14/2011RECORD INDEX
01/14/2011RECORD COPIES
01/19/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/25/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
03/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/2/11 (opp) (DCHA)
03/31/2011RECEIVED- aples amended cetificate of service to motion for extension of time
04/01/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/05/2011TMC - motion to extend briefing (-) - motion for summary affirmance (MPD) - oppo - motion for summary affirmance (DCHA) - oppo
04/08/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to aple's motion for summary affirmance and brief also the motion for extension of time
04/19/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (DC Housing Authority)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to aple's motion for summary affirmance and brief.
06/22/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEES' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE ARE GRANTED... It is ****MORE*****
06/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEES' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to file the brief IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is ***MORE***
06/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (RZTHNB)
07/06/2011APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
09/06/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing en banc
09/07/2011FiledMandate