judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00063-CR
06-94-00063-CR
03/11/1994
Robbery
Gray, Jonathan Bernard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1995Mandate Issued
05/08/1995Case Returned from Higher Ct.
04/12/1995Petition for Discretionary Review FiledWRIT REFUSED
02/09/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/25/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
01/04/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/18/1994Submitted
10/18/1994Submission
09/19/1994Request for Oral Argument
09/15/1994Submission
08/02/1994Brief Filed
08/02/1994Case ready to be set
07/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/05/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/13/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/02/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/03/1994Brief Filed
05/03/1994Request for Oral Argument
04/18/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/08/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/04/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/04/1994Holding for Record
03/11/1994Transcript Filed
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/10/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/08/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gray, Jonathan BernardAppellantHon. Pam Campbell
Trial Court Information
6th District Court
Lamar
14821
50 Yrs TDC