judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00129-CV
13-94-00129-CV
03/11/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Medline Industries, Inc.
Pena, Pedro, Individually and d/b/a Payless Medical Supply
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/26/1994Mandate Issued
06/30/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
06/30/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedDismissed
06/08/1994Filing Fee Paid
06/01/1994Motion for Leave to File Transcript
05/27/1994Filing Fee Paid
05/26/1994Green card in
05/24/199410 day letter sent
05/19/1994Transcript Received
05/18/1994Certificate Filed
05/13/1994Certified copies
05/12/1994Document Filed
05/12/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
05/12/1994Statement of Facts Received
05/05/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/25/1994Certified copies
04/19/1994Brief received.
04/19/1994Miscellaneous Motion
04/19/1994Oral argument requested
04/14/1994Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/28/1994Filing Fee Paid
03/28/1994Statement Filed
03/28/1994Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
03/11/1994Miscellaneous Motion
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/26/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pena, Pedro Individually AndAppelleePedro Pena
Medline Industries, Inc.AppellantRobert B. McLeaish
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Cameron
Honorable Adolfo G Betancourt
CL-B-31,677