judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

A.F. CONSTRUCTION VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36362
Short Caption:A.F. CONSTRUCTION VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37585
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A420360Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:ShearingCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/29/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/29/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus. Filed via fax. 00-11106
06/29/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service of Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus. Filed via fax. 00-11124
06/29/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver.
06/29/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Receipt of Copy of Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus. 00-11157
06/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 10 days. Cause appearing, we temporarily stay all proceedings in the matter below pending receipt of the answer of the real parties in interest. 00-11160
07/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lavelle & Associates-check no. 4029.
07/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Original of Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus (filed via fax on 6/29/00). 00-11352
07/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service of Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus (filed via fax on 6/29/00). 00-11353
07/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy of Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus. 00-11380
07/06/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Virgin River Casino Corporation. 00-11538
07/06/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Application for Permission to File Reply to Opposition to Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus. 00-11540
07/10/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Richard Roy Kelley's Answer to A.F. Construction's Emergency Ex-Parte Appliction for Writ of Mandamus. 00-11749
07/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy of the Application for Permission to File Reply to Opposition to Emergency Ex Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus (Judge Vega). 00-11901
07/11/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Richard Roy Kelly's Supplement to Answer to A.F. Construction's Emergency Ex-Parte Application for Writ of Mandamus. 00-11902
07/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant petitioner's motion filed on July 6, 2000, requesting permission to file a reply to the real parties in interest's answers to the petition filed in this matter. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file its reply. 00-12346
07/18/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. Due Date: 10 days
07/19/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-12455
07/26/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from law firm of Gordon & Silver, Ltd. William M. Noall and Bradley N. Boodt represent real party in interest Richard Roy Kelley. 00-12958
07/31/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus (received in the Las Vegas office on 7/27/00). 00-13172
07/31/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Jeffrey R. Albregts. He represents Virgin River Casino Corporation in this action. 00-13206
07/31/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Response to Notice to Confirm as Counsel. Attorney Douglas D. Gerrard, of the law firm of Gerrard & Cox, is counsel of record for Virgin River Casino Corporation. 00-13207
08/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Reply Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-13417
08/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy of Reply Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Signed by Judge Cherry) 00-13418
08/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy of Reply Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Judge Vega) 00-13420
08/04/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Response to Notice to Confirm as Counsel. Lavelle-Stubberud & Associates as counsel for A.F. Construction Company. 00-13517
08/08/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Certificate of Mailing of Response to Notice to Confirm as Counsel. 00-13715
10/05/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[In the opposition to the petition, real party in interest Richard Roy Kelley requests that this court's temporary stay remain in effect as to Virgin River Casino Corporation's trustee's sale for a period of six days after the stay of Kelley's trustee's sale is lifted. We deny the request. We vacate our prior order temporarily staying all proceedings in the matter below, which we entered on June 30, 2000.] NNP00A-RR/DA/ML 00-17639
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-17721
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.