judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HORTENSIA PARKER V. LUSTINE REALTY COMPANY, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1572
Short Caption:HORTENSIA PARKER V. LUSTINE REALTY COMPANY, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB27143-10Filed Date:12/14/2010

Opening Event Date:12/14/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHortensia Parker Y
Vytas Varekojis Vergeer NN
AppelleeLustine Realty Company Inc.N
Brian D. RigerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 14, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
01/14/2011RECEIVED- Request for transcripts (*construed as the MAT) (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED FOR 11/18/10) (elp)
02/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (8-pgs/tape 11/18/10 proc.)w/cd
02/08/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/11/2011RECORD INDEX
02/11/2011RECORD COPIES
03/09/2011STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL
03/17/2011 On consideration of the stipulation of dismissal file by the parties, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed and the parties agree that there are no costs or fees to be paid. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b)(2). (ETW) elp
03/17/2011DISMISSED
04/08/2011MANDATE ISSUED