judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRANKLIN M. RIVERS, JR., M.D. v. MOORE, MYERS & GARLAND, LLC; a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; JOSEPH F. MOORE, JR.; GLENN M. FORD; and ABIGAIL S. MOORE

Case Heading (S-09-0048)
Case Number:S-09-0048Case Docketed On:03/10/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:FRANKLIN M. RIVERS, JR., M.D. v. MOORE, MYERS & GARLAND, LLC; a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; JOSEPH F. MOORE, JR.; GLENN M. FORD; and ABIGAIL S. MOORE
Full Title:FRANKLIN M. RIVERS, JR., M.D., Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MOORE, MYERS & GARLAND, LLC; a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; JOSEPH F. MOORE, JR.; GLENN M. FORD; and ABIGAIL S. MOORE, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFranklin M. Rivers MDEldon E. Silverman
AppelleeMoore, Myers & Garland, LLCWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeJoseph F. Moore Jr.Weston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeGlenn Martin FordWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeAbigail Susan MooreWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Professional negligence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 102
Citation:236 P.3d 284

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/10/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/10/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/27/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Opening brief of appellant Franklin M. Rivers, Jr., M.D.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/12/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/15/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo by Chief Justice VoigtNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/30/2009Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Keith G. Kautz assigned to act for Chief Justice Voigt in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/30/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Franklin M. Rivers, Jr. M.D.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
07/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to vacate and reset oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/07/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
07/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/10/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Exhibits & Transcripts; Volume IV, Deposition Exhibit Binder; Volume V, Deposition Transcript Binder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - W.W. Reeves and Anna Reeves Olson for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eldon Silverman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
09/23/2009Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court clerk. One additional volume, original papers, labeled as Volume VI.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
09/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Kite and Burke, and Kautz, DJ (Eldon E. Silverman for appellant; Anna M. Reeves Olson and Weston W. Reeves, argument by Mr. Reeves for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Errata in Reply Brief of Appellant Franklin M. Rivers, Jr., M.D. (Hardcopies untimely, received five days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/13/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/13/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/20/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal