judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TAYLOR GLASS, ET AL. v. STEEN SMITH, ET AL.

Case: A-3171
A-3171
04/30/1951
Application for Writ of Error
TAYLOR GLASS, ET AL.
STEEN SMITH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/28/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/13/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/07/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/16/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/10/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
04/30/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/02/1952Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
04/03/1952Order from Lower Court filed
04/02/1952Motion to dismiss
01/18/1952Mandate issued
12/28/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/13/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/28/1951Dissenting opinion issued.
11/28/1951Opinion issued
09/07/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/16/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/06/1951Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1951Document received (See Remarks)
06/06/1951Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1951Response to Petition
04/30/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/30/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. H. Kelley, C. O. Ryan, and T. E. MosheimAmicus Curiae
R. E. Royer, Heard L. Floore, Sam A. WoodwardAmicus Curiae
Steen Smith, et al.Respondent
Texas State Association of Fire FightersAmicus Curiae
Taylor Glass, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information