judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00399-CV
05-94-00399-CV
03/11/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Todora, Pete
Judith Todora
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/08/1994Appeal Bond Filed
02/11/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1992Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
255th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Donald Koons
93-05984-S