judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-94-00060-CV
08-94-00060-CV
03/11/1994
Other Personal Injury
Columbia Universal Life Insurance Company
Miles, Carl David
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/09/2016Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/13/1998Mandate Issued
01/13/1998Shuck purged
01/13/1998Mandate Issued
11/17/1997Case Returned from Higher Court
11/17/1997Decision from Supreme Court or CCAMotion or Writ Denied
09/06/1996Fee paid
08/01/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/22/1996Application for Writ of Error
07/22/1996Fee paid
06/21/1996Fee paid
06/21/1996Fee paid
06/20/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/18/1996Fee paid
06/06/1996Fee paid
06/03/1996Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
06/03/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/28/1996Fee paid
05/16/1996Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
05/16/1996Payment of fee due requested
05/16/1996Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
01/10/1996Submitted
01/10/1996Submission
01/10/1996Submitted
11/22/1995Submission
10/02/1995Fee paid
09/21/1995Payment of fee due requested
09/01/1995Brief Filed
09/01/1995Case ready to be set
09/01/1995Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
09/01/1995Case ready to be set
08/09/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/09/1995Order entered
07/28/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/12/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/26/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
06/14/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/01/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/03/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/13/1995Brief Filed
02/22/1995Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/13/1995Fee paid
02/10/1995Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/11/1995Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/11/1995Statement of Facts Filed
12/27/1994Fee paid
12/27/1994Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
12/07/1994Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/1994Order entered
11/28/1994Fee paid
11/23/1994Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
11/02/1994Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/1994Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
10/19/1994Payment of fee due requested
09/19/1994Fee paid
09/07/1994Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/07/1994Order entered
08/25/1994Fee paid
08/22/1994Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
08/22/1994Payment of fee due requested
08/03/1994Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1994Fee paid
07/25/1994Fee paid
07/20/1994Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
07/20/1994Payment of fee due requested
06/08/1994Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/1994Fee paid
05/23/1994Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
05/23/1994Payment of fee due requested
05/23/1994Payment of fee due requested
04/06/1994Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/01/1994Fee paid
03/24/1994Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
03/11/1994Fee paid
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/11/1994Transcript Filed
03/11/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/09/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
COLUMBIA UNIVERSAL LIFE INSURAAppellantHon. Robert E. Motsenbocker
MILES, CARL DAVIDAppelleeHon. Robert E. White
Trial Court Information
70th District Court
Ector
Honorable Tryon D. Lewis
A-85-070