judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00078-CV
02-94-00078-CV
03/16/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Drake, Betty
Kroger Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/16/1995Mandate Issued
10/05/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/01/1995Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/04/1995Writ Filed
03/30/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/27/1995Response Filed
02/16/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/26/1995Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/1995Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
12/30/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/19/1994Motion FiledItem is Moot
12/12/1994No Description Available.
12/05/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/01/1994Motion Filed
10/19/1994Submitted
10/19/1994Submission
10/10/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
09/02/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1994Motion Filed
08/26/1994Brief Filed
08/26/1994Case ready to be set
06/27/1994Brief Filed
04/12/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/11/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/28/1994Submission
03/16/1994No Description Available.
03/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Drake, BettyAppellantJames D. Neel
David Horton
Kroger CompanyAppelleeMichael P. Maslanka
Trial Court Information
352nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Leo Everett Young
352-133260-91