Case Information: 36355 | |||
Short Caption: | ALCANTARA VS. NEVADA STATE WELFARE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9201565 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/28/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
06/28/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-11062 | |
06/28/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
07/24/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We note that appellant has failed to pay the filing fee required pursuant to NRS 2.250. This constitutes an independent basis for dismissing this appeal.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-12750 | |
08/21/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14573 | |
08/21/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/24/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 23, 2000. | 00-14573 |