judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-7307
B-7307
01/16/1978
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHWESTERN APPAREL, INC., ET AL.
TEXAS POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, DALLAS POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, HOUSTON NATURAL GAS CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/01/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
02/10/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
01/31/1978Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
01/30/1978Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
01/16/1978Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/01/1978Response to Petition
02/10/1978Response to Petition
01/31/1978Brief in Support of Petition
01/31/1978Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseDenied
01/31/1978Motion to dismissFiling granted
01/31/1978Motion to dismissFiling granted
01/30/1978Brief in Support of Petition
01/30/1978Motion to dismissFiling granted
01/28/1978Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseDenied
01/16/1978Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/16/1978Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwestern Apparel, Inc., et al.Petitioner
Dallas Power and Light CompanyRespondent
Houston Natural Gas CorporationRespondent
TEXAS POWER AND LIGHT COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information