judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00043-CR
10-94-00043-CR
03/16/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Patrick Deon Lyons
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/1997Case stored
04/07/1997Mandate issued by this Court
01/23/1997Mandate recalled
01/15/1997Order to Trial Court withdrawing mandate
07/13/1995Case stored
07/10/1995Mandate issued by this Court
05/24/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/22/1995Submitted
02/22/1995Submission
01/12/1995Submission
01/03/1995Case ready to be set
01/03/1995No Description Available.
12/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
11/22/1994No Description Available.
11/02/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
09/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
08/17/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/12/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
06/08/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/03/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
04/27/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/25/1994No Description Available.
04/25/1994No Description Available.
04/25/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/24/1994No Description Available.
03/16/1994No Description Available.
03/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/2097Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lyons, Patrick DeonAppellantJ. Kent McGuire
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHon. Joe F. Grubbs
Cynthia W. Hellstern
Trial Court Information
40th District Court
Ellis
Honorable Gene Knize
19778-CR
Life