judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0280
94-0280
03/16/1994
APPEAL REGARDING ATTORNEY DISCIPLINARY ACTION
IN THE MATTER OF CHARLES W. YUILL JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/16/1994Notice of Appeal filedDisciplinary AppealDisciplinary Appeal
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/06/1994Case Stored
07/28/1994Motion to dismiss disposedFiling grantedSTATE BAR'S MO/DISMISS APPEAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION GRANTED
07/28/1994Disciplinary Appeal disposedDismissed
07/01/1994Reply to Response to Motionno opposition to motion to dismiss
06/15/1994Motion to dismiss application for writ of error"Motion to Dismiss for want of prosecution"
06/15/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/13/1994Reply to Response to Motionand objection to request for relief under Part XII of TX Rules of Disc. Proc. Orig & 1 fwd.
04/11/1994Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing granted
04/08/1994Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedM/E/T to file Appellant Brief Orig & 1 fwd.
03/29/1994Motion for Extension of Time disposed.Filing grantedmotion to extend time for filing appeal granted to 04-15-94
03/28/1994Motion for Extension of Time filed"Motion to Extend Time for Filing Appeal"
03/23/1994Letter FiledOf Mr. Timothy Kelley on behalf of Mr. Yuill
03/16/1994Notice of Appeal filedDisciplinary Appeal
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
09/06/1994Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE BAR OF TEXASAppelleeMs. Linda Acevedo
Ms. Nancy M. Thursby
BOARD OF DISCIPLINARY APPEALSAppelleeMs. Christine E. McKeeman
Yuill, Jr., Charles W.AppellantMr. Timothy E. Kelley
Bader, RichardAppelleeMr. Richard Bader
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information