judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00142-CV
03-94-00142-CV
03/16/1994
Administrative law
Tharwat M. Hamamcy, M.D.
Texas State Board of Medical Examiners
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/01/1997CASE STORED
04/15/1996Mandate Issued
12/06/1995Case returned from higher court
10/19/1995Appl Writ to Supreme Court denied
09/20/1995Case forwarded to higher court
09/14/1995Petition for writ of mandamus
08/16/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/12/1995Motion for rehearing filed
06/21/1995Opinion issuedJudgment vacated and cause dismissed
03/03/1995Submitted
03/03/1995Submission
02/23/1995miscellaneous motion dispOverruled
02/16/1995miscellaneous motion dispDismissed
02/10/1995Brief filed
02/10/1995miscellaneous motion dispMotion or Writ Granted
02/10/1995Submission
02/09/1995miscellaneous motion filed
01/30/1995miscellaneous motion filed
01/25/1995Brief received, not filed
01/25/1995miscellaneous motion filed
01/09/1995Case ready to be set
01/09/1995Oral argument request overruled by CourtOverruled
09/12/1994Letter received
06/30/1994Brief filed
06/30/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/29/1994Brief received, not filed
06/17/1994Response to Motion
06/16/1994Response requested (postcard)
06/13/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/01/1994Letter received
05/25/1994Response to Motion
05/18/1994Response requested (postcard)
05/11/1994Response requested (postcard)
05/04/1994Follow up letter regarding unpaid fee
04/11/1994Letter received
03/22/1994Statement of Facts Filed
03/22/1994Response requested (postcard)
03/16/1994Transcript Filed
03/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas State Board Of Medical EAppelleeMs. Jennifer Gilchrist
The Honorable Dan Morales
Hamamcy, M.D., Tharwat M.AppellantTharwat M. Hamamcy, M.d.
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Margaret A. Cooper
93-09583