judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00118-CV
09-94-00118-CV
03/16/1994
Real Property
Mackan, Ruth Laidecker and Seaberg, Blanch Laidacker
Fregia, W. P.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/1995Mandate Issued
07/05/1995MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
05/19/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/19/1995Order Enteredvacate tc judgment and remand
05/19/1995Motion for rehearing granted
05/11/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/11/1995Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/11/1995Mt for ext time to file Mt for Rehearing Filed
04/13/1995Order EnteredDismissed
04/05/1995Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/16/1995Case ready to be set
02/14/1995Submission
06/08/1994Brief Filed
06/08/1994Case ready to be set
06/03/1994Response
05/26/1994Mot ext time file STRANS DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
05/25/1994Mt extension of time file Supplemental Trans filed
05/24/1994Supplemental Transcript Received
05/16/1994Brief Filed
04/14/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/12/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/22/1994Letter
03/16/1994Transcript Filed
03/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/16/1994RECUSALJudge Recused
07/05/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Flynn, William H.AppellantWilliam M. Flynn
Laidacker, BlanchAppellantCharles R. Roach
Fregia, W. P.AppelleeRichard N. Evans
Mackan, Ruth LaideckerAppellantCharles R. Roach
Trial Court Information
88th District Court
Hardin
Honorable David V. Wilson
32431