judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00161-CR
04-94-00161-CR
03/16/1994
Theft
Hernandez, Alfredo Guajardo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/10/2017Internal memo
04/24/1995Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/13/1995Mandate Issued
04/13/1995Mandate Issued
01/31/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/31/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/25/1995Submitted
01/25/1995Submission
01/25/1995Submitted
12/21/1994Submission
11/22/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/1994Case ready to be set
11/21/1994Brief Filed
11/21/1994Case ready to be set
11/14/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/18/1994Brief Filed
09/26/1994Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
09/26/1994Order Entered
09/20/1994Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Filed
09/20/1994No Description Available.
08/23/1994Order Entered
07/11/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/11/1994Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
05/19/1994Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/18/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/1994Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/09/1994Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
04/11/1994No Description Available.
04/11/1994No Description Available.
04/11/1994No Description Available.
04/07/1994No Description Available.
03/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/11/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/10/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/13/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
07/10/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - AppellantVincent D. Callahan
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMargaret M. Fent
Trial Court Information
226th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sid L. Harle
93-CR-4377
Five (5) years