judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0299-94
PD-0299-94
03/16/1994
PDR Case Type
WATKINS, TERRY ALLAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/18/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
03/28/1994PDR FILED
03/28/1994PDR FILED
03/16/1994PDR FILED
03/16/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJames Howell Cromwell
WATKINS, TERRY ALLANApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John R. Heath
Court of Appeals Information:
12-90-00277-CR
REF & AFF 10-14-93
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
369th District Court
Cherokee
Honorable BASCOM BENTLEY III
11073