judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00430-CV
05-94-00430-CV
03/16/1994
Contract
William C. Dear & Associates, Inc.
Plastronics, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/04/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
03/22/1994MattConv
03/16/1994Transcript Filed
03/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/21/1994Appeal Bond Filed
01/28/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/1992Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Dallas
CC94-970-D