judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00097-CR
02-94-00097-CR
03/16/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Johnson, Leartis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/02/1996Mandate Issued
02/15/1996Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/09/1996Letter Brief Filed
05/24/1995Submitted
05/24/1995Submission
05/19/1995Letter
03/08/1995Brief Filed
03/08/1995Case ready to be set
11/17/1994Brief Filed
11/17/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/04/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1994Motion Filed
06/21/1994Exhibits Filed
06/21/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/21/1994No Description Available.
06/21/1994Submission
06/10/1994Exhibits Filed
06/10/1994No Description Available.
06/10/1994No Description Available.
03/16/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/16/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/02/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Johnson, LeartisCriminal - AppellantRobert Ford
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Sharen Wilson
0494524D
80 YRS IDTDCJ/$10,000 FINE