judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLAINE HIGHTOWER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1552
Short Caption:CHARLAINE HIGHTOWER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1982-10Filed Date:12/08/2010

Opening Event Date:12/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:07/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/03/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharlaine Hightower Y
Eric H. KirchmanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Laura G. Coates YN
Sharon A. SpragueNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Eric Kirchman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/03/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Eric Kirchman, Esqire
02/02/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
03/21/2011RECORD INDEX
03/21/2011RECORD COPIES
03/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (98pgs/Gilliam) 11/2/10 proc.
03/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (15pgs/Swaringer) 11/5/10 proc.
03/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (11pgs/Tape) 11/10/10 proc. w/CD
03/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo for 30 days
05/12/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 2, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 10 days (no oppo)
06/08/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 13, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
06/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/13/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
07/18/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/18/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/08/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/09/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Steadman
12/29/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
01/12/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
03/02/2012FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
03/13/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File appellee's response to appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc Other (Appellee)Granted
03/19/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the response to appellant's petition to 5/15/12.
05/15/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's petition for rehearing en banc (Appellee)
07/03/2012FiledORDERED that appellant's petition for rehearing en banc is denied.
12/03/2012FiledMandate