judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4137
B-4137
07/23/1973
Application for Writ of Error
JOE DULAK, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF CONSTANCE DULAK
FRANK DULAK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/26/1974Letter brief Petitioner
08/09/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/05/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/05/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/17/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/23/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/26/1974Letter brief
09/24/1974Letter Filed
08/14/1974Response to Motion filed
08/09/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/25/1974Opinion issued
07/10/1974Response to Motion filed
07/08/1974Response to Motion filed
07/05/1974Motion for Rehearing
07/05/1974Motion for Rehearing
06/19/1974Opinion issued
02/27/1974Letter Filed
02/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
08/17/1973Brief on the Merits
07/23/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/23/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe Dulak, individually and as Independent Executor of the Estate of Constance DulakPetitioner
Frank Dulak, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information