judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4138
B-4138
07/23/1973
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
JUDYTH S. TENNISON, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/14/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/16/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
07/23/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/14/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/01/1974Concurring Opinion issued.
05/01/1974Opinion issued
01/29/1974Miscellaneous letter
11/16/1973Response to Petition
09/25/1973Document received (See Remarks)
09/10/1973Brief on the Merits
07/23/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/23/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of TexasPetitioner
Judyth S. Tennison, et virRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information