judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4124
B-4124
07/17/1973
Application for Writ of Error
TRIPHENE MIDDLETON, ET AL.
LOUIS M. BROUSSARD, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/30/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
08/01/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/06/1974Response to Motion filed
01/30/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/16/1974Opinion issued
10/10/1973Document received (See Remarks)
08/01/1973Response to Petition
07/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Louis M. Broussard, et al.Respondent
Triphene Middleton, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information