judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4128
B-4128
07/17/1973
Application for Writ of Error
RAUL C. FRANCO AND MARIA T. FRANCO
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/27/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/11/1973Response to Brief filedRespondent
12/05/1973Post submission brief filedPetitioner
11/30/1973Post submission brief filedRespondent
08/01/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
08/01/1973Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
07/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/05/1974Response to Motion filed
02/27/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/13/1974Opinion issued
12/11/1973Response to Brief filed
12/05/1973Post submission brief filed
11/30/1973Post submission brief filed
10/24/1973Document received (See Remarks)
08/01/1973Response to Petition
08/01/1973Response to Petition
07/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Raul C. Franco and Maria T. FrancoPetitioner
Allstate Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information