judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ODDIE SHOPPING CENTER VS. REBEL OIL CO

Case Information: 34905
Short Caption:ODDIE SHOPPING CENTER VS. REBEL OIL COCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9406099Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/15/1999 / Cobb, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from McDonald Carano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich & Hicks--check no. 0023081.
09/29/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
09/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09355
10/12/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger--check no. 013514.
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 99-09891
10/15/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William G. Cobb. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/20/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
01/06/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 18, 2000 with counsel and January 24, 2000 with counsel and parties. 00-00236
02/07/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. The parties are continuing negotiations. Report should be submitted within two to three weeks. 00-01889
07/11/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 12, 2000. 00-11932
07/13/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (Settlement Agreement attached per RC). 00-12129
09/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant/cross-respondent has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-15772
09/08/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-15853
09/21/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Order Dismissing Appeal and Cross-Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-16661
09/21/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.