judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL J. SINDRAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1623
Short Caption:MICHAEL J. SINDRAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Mot. To Seal Arr. Rec.
Lead:10-CO-1623Consolidated: 11-CO-0391
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3158-08Filed Date:12/27/2010

Opening Event Date:12/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/15/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael J. Sindram YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kenechukwu O. Okocha NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/10/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW how he is aggrieved by the 12/15/10 order since the underlying case against him has been dismissed... (BY: ETW)
02/28/2011 ORDERED, SS, that this court JANUARY 10, 2011 OTSC IS HEREBY VACATED. It is *****MORE*****
02/28/2011 F/ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (BY: ETW) LW
03/07/2011RECORD INDEX
03/07/2011RECORD COPIES
03/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/26/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CO-1623 and 11-CO-391 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that apepllant shall file his consolidated brief and the limited appendix within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (By: JAC)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (no limited appendix attached)
06/06/2011RECEIVED - duplicate filing titled Appellant's Brief and Limited Appendix - 4 copies of the limited appendix not included. Returned to Appellant by mail
06/10/2011RECEIVED - returned documents submitted for filing - documents sent to the file
06/14/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on May 2, 2011, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before June 6, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (Castillo)
07/14/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeals. See D.C. App. R. 13.
07/19/2011FiledDismissed
07/22/2011FiledMotion To Reinstate Appeal (with attached documents) (Appellant)Granted
09/01/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion To Reinstate Appeal, file the lodged limited appendix and directing appellee's brief in 30
09/01/2011Filedlimited Appendix of appellant (Appellant)
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
10/04/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
12/20/2011FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Grant Summary Affirmance and filing appellant's lodged late opposition (FITHNK)
12/20/2011FiledAffirmed
12/20/2011FiledOpposition - to aple's motion for summary affirmance (Titled as: Aplt's response to motion for summary affirmance) (Appellant)
12/29/2011LodgedMotion To Reconsider this Court's Order dated 12/20/2011 granting Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (served by DCCA) (Appellant)
01/10/2012LodgedReceived Motion To Reconsider this Court's Order dated 12/20/2011 granting Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance (does not conform to Rule 27 for filing motions) (Appellant)
05/15/2014FiledMandate