judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSHUA TODD ALPHIN v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0085)
Case Number:S-09-0085Case Docketed On:04/27/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:JOSHUA TODD ALPHIN v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:JOSHUA TODD ALPHIN, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoshua Todd AlphinDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Cara Boyle Chambers

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2010 WY 39
Citation:228 P.3d 61

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/27/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/27/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution - James Michael Causey as counsel for appellee, State of Wyoming, ex rel., Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division.Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
06/10/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant Joshua T. Alphin; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/27/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/14/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant Joshua T. Alphin.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/06/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/01/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/12/2010Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
04/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for attorney's fees and fees and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2010Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/27/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/27/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/03/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/29/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal